Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/05/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 08/05/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 08/05/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 08/05/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/05/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/05/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 10/05/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/05/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/05/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 10/05/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/05/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/05/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 10/05/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/05/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/05/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/05/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/05/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/05/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/05/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/05/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 10/05/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/05/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/05/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/05/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/05/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 10/05/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/05/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/05/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/05/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/05/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/05/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/05/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/05/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/06/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/06/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/06/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/06/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 10/06/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/06/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 10/06/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/06/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/06/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 10/06/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/06/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/06/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/07/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 10/07/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/07/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/07/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/07/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/07/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 10/07/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/13/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/13/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/13/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/13/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/13/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/18/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 10/18/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/18/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/26/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/26/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 10/26/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/26/1993