Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 09/24/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/24/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/24/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/24/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/24/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/24/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/24/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/24/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/24/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/24/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/28/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/28/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/29/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 09/29/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/15/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/20/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 10/21/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/25/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/25/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/25/1993