Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/15/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/20/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/20/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/20/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/23/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/23/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/23/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/23/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/23/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 09/23/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/23/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/28/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/28/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/28/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/28/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/30/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/30/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/30/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 09/30/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/06/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/06/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/06/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/06/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/06/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/06/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/07/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/07/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 10/07/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/13/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/13/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/13/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/13/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/13/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/13/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/13/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/13/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/14/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/14/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/14/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/14/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/14/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/14/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 10/15/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 10/19/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/25/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 10/27/1993