Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 09/15/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/22/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/22/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/22/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/22/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/22/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/22/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 09/22/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/22/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 10/05/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/05/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/05/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/05/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/13/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 10/13/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/13/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/13/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/13/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/18/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/25/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/25/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/25/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 10/26/1993