Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 10/04/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/04/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/13/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 10/13/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/13/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 10/13/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 10/13/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 10/13/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 10/13/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/13/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/13/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/13/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/13/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/13/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 10/13/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/13/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/13/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/13/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/13/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/13/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 10/13/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/13/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/13/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/13/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/13/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 10/13/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/13/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/13/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/13/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/13/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/13/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/13/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/13/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/13/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/13/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 10/13/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/13/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/13/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/13/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 10/13/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/13/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/13/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 10/25/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/03/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 11/09/1993