Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/07/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/07/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/07/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/07/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/07/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/07/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/07/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 10/07/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 10/07/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/07/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/07/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 10/07/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/13/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/13/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/13/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/13/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/13/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/13/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/13/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/13/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/13/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/13/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/13/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/13/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/13/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/13/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 10/13/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/13/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/13/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/14/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/14/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/14/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/14/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/18/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/18/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/19/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 10/20/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/20/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 10/20/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/21/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/21/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/26/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 11/01/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 11/01/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/01/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 11/10/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/10/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/10/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 11/22/1993