Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 10/05/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 10/05/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 10/05/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 10/13/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/13/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/13/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/13/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/14/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 10/14/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/14/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/15/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/19/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/19/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/19/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/21/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/21/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/27/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/27/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 11/16/1993