Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 01/27/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 01/27/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/27/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 01/27/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 01/27/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 01/27/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 01/27/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/28/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/07/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/07/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/07/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/09/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/09/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/09/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/22/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/22/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/22/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/22/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/22/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/22/1994
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/22/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/24/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/08/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/08/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/10/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/17/1994
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/17/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/11/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/11/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/11/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/11/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/11/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/11/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/12/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/13/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 04/13/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/14/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/14/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/20/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/20/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/26/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/26/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/26/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 04/26/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/02/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/02/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/02/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/02/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/02/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/02/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 05/02/1994
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 05/02/1994