Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 10/29/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/08/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/08/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/08/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/08/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/08/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/08/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/08/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/08/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/08/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/08/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 02/08/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/08/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/08/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/08/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/08/1994
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/22/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/22/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/22/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/22/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/22/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/22/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/22/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/22/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/22/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/22/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/22/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/22/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/22/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 02/22/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/22/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/22/1994
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/22/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/22/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/24/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/25/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/25/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/01/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/01/1994