Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 11/16/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/16/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/22/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/22/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 02/22/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/23/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/24/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/02/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/02/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/02/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/02/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 03/02/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/02/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/02/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/02/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/02/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/02/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/02/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/02/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/02/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/02/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/02/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 03/02/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/02/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/02/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/02/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/02/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/02/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/02/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/02/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/02/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/02/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/02/1994
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 03/02/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/02/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/15/1994