There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate the week beginning on November 21, 1993 and ending on November 27, 1993, and the week beginning on November 20, 1994 and ending on November 26, 1994, as "National Family Caregivers Week".


Actions Overview (9)

Date
08/26/1994 Became Public Law No: 103-319.
08/26/1994 Signed by President.
08/17/1994 Presented to President.
08/12/1994 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to house amendments and the amendment to the title by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S11477)
08/05/1994 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
08/05/1994 Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
06/24/1994 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S7658)
06/23/1994 Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
11/18/1993 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
08/26/1994 Became Public Law No: 103-319.
08/26/1994 Signed by President.
08/17/1994 Senate Presented to President.
08/16/1994 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
08/12/1994 Senate Senate agreed to house amendments and the amendment to the title by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S11477)
08/09/1994 Senate Message on House action received in Senate and at the desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
08/05/1994-2:45pm House The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
08/05/1994-2:44pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/05/1994-2:44pm House On passage Passed without objection.
08/05/1994-2:44pm House H.Amdt.827 On agreeing to the Byrne amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
08/05/1994-2:44pm House H.Amdt.827 Amendment (A001) offered by Mrs. Byrne.
08/05/1994-2:43pm House Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7026-7027)
08/05/1994-2:43pm House Mrs. Byrne asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
08/05/1994 House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
06/27/1994 House Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
06/27/1994-1:50pm House Received in the House.
06/27/1994 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
06/24/1994 Senate Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7658)
06/23/1994 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 485.
06/23/1994 Senate Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/23/1994 Senate Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/18/1993 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
11/18/1993 Senate Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S16229-16230)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary11/18/1993 Referred to
06/23/1994 Markup by
06/23/1994 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service06/27/1994 Referred to
08/05/1994 Discharged from

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.153.

Subjects (5)

  • Caregivers
  • Commemorations
  • Special weeks

Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.153. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/05/1994)

Designates the week of November 20 through 26, 1994, as National Family Caregivers Week.