Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/10/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/10/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/10/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/10/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 04/21/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/21/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/21/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/21/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/23/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/23/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/23/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/23/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/23/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/23/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/23/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/23/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/23/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/23/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/23/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/20/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/20/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/20/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/20/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/20/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/20/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/20/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/20/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/20/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/20/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/22/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/22/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/22/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/22/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/22/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/28/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/28/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/28/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/28/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/28/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/28/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/28/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/28/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/28/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/28/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/28/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/28/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/28/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/28/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/28/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/28/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/28/1994