Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/02/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/07/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/07/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/07/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/07/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/07/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/07/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/07/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 02/07/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/07/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 02/07/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/07/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/07/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 02/08/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/08/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/08/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/09/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/09/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/09/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/22/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/22/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/22/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/22/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/22/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/22/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/22/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/22/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 02/22/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/22/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/28/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/28/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/28/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/02/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/02/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/02/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/02/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/02/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/02/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/07/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/07/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/07/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/07/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/11/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/11/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 03/11/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/11/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/11/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/11/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 04/14/1994