Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 03/15/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/15/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/25/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/20/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/20/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/21/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/25/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/02/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/04/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 05/05/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/09/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 05/09/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/11/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/12/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/23/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/14/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/15/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/15/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 06/16/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/20/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/21/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/21/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/21/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/28/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/01/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/01/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/13/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/13/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/18/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/22/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/26/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/26/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/26/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/27/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/29/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/29/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/29/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/29/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 08/01/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/01/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 08/08/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 08/08/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/10/1994