Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/07/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/07/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 03/07/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 03/24/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 03/24/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/24/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/24/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/24/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/24/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 03/24/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/24/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/24/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/14/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/02/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 05/25/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/25/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/25/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/25/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/25/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/25/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/25/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/25/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/25/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/25/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/25/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/25/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/25/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/25/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/25/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/25/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/07/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/07/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/07/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/07/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/07/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/07/1994