Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/11/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/11/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/11/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 03/11/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 03/11/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 03/11/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/13/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/13/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/13/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 04/13/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/13/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 04/13/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 04/13/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/13/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/13/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/19/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/29/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/29/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/29/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/29/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/29/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/29/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/29/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/29/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/29/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/29/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/15/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/15/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/15/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/15/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/15/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/15/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/29/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 08/11/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 08/11/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 08/11/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 08/11/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 08/11/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/11/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/11/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 08/11/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 08/11/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 08/24/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 08/24/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 08/24/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 08/24/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 08/24/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 08/24/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 08/24/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 08/24/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 08/24/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/26/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/26/1994