Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/16/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/16/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/16/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/16/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/16/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/16/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/16/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/16/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/22/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/22/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/22/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/22/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/22/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/22/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/22/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/22/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 03/22/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/22/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/22/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/22/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/23/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/23/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/23/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/25/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/25/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/25/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/25/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/25/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/25/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/25/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/12/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/12/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 04/12/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/12/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 04/12/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/12/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/12/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/12/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/12/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/14/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/14/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 04/19/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/19/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/19/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/19/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/20/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/20/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/20/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/20/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/21/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/21/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/21/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/26/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 05/03/1994