Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/19/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/19/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/19/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/19/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/19/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/19/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/19/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 04/19/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/19/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/18/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/18/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/18/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 05/18/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/18/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/18/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/18/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 05/18/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/18/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/18/1994
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 05/18/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/18/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/18/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/18/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/18/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/18/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/18/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/18/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 05/18/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/18/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 05/18/1994
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/23/1994
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/23/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/23/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/23/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/23/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/23/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/23/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/23/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/23/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 05/23/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/23/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/23/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/23/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 05/23/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/23/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/23/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/23/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/23/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/23/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/23/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/23/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/25/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 05/25/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/07/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/07/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 06/20/1994