Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 04/11/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/11/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/12/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/12/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/12/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/19/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/19/1994
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/19/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/19/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/19/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 04/19/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/19/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/19/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/19/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/19/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 04/19/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/19/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/19/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/19/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/02/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/02/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/02/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/02/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/02/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/02/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 05/02/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/02/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/02/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/02/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/02/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/02/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/02/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/10/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/10/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/10/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/10/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/10/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/18/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/18/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/18/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 05/18/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/18/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/18/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/18/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/18/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/10/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/10/1994