Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/02/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/02/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/03/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 05/03/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 05/11/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/11/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/11/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/11/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 05/19/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/19/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/19/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/24/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/24/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/24/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/24/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/25/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/25/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/25/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/25/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/25/1994
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/07/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/07/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/07/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/07/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/07/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/08/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/10/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/10/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/10/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/10/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/10/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/14/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/14/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/14/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/14/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/14/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/14/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/16/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/16/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/16/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/16/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/22/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/22/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/22/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/22/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/29/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/15/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/15/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/15/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/15/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 08/08/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 08/16/1994