Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 04/14/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/14/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/14/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/21/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/21/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/21/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/21/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/26/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/26/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/03/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/03/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/03/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/03/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/03/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/03/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/05/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/05/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 05/05/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/05/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 05/05/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/05/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/05/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/05/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/05/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 05/05/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/09/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/09/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/11/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/11/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/16/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/16/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/08/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/26/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/27/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 09/27/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/27/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/27/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/27/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 10/06/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 10/06/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/06/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/06/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/06/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/06/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/06/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/06/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/07/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/07/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/07/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/07/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/07/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/07/1994