Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 04/20/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/10/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 05/11/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 05/12/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/16/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/16/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/18/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/18/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/18/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/19/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/19/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/23/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/24/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/24/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/25/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/25/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 06/07/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/07/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/09/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/09/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/09/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/21/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/21/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/11/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/11/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/13/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/13/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/13/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/19/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/19/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/21/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/25/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/25/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/25/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/27/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/27/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/04/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/21/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/21/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/28/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/04/1994