Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 05/05/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/05/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/25/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/25/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 05/25/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/25/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/25/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/25/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/25/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/25/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/25/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/09/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/09/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/09/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/09/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/09/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/09/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/09/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/09/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/09/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/09/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/09/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/10/1994
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/28/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/28/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/28/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/28/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/28/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/28/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/28/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/28/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/28/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/13/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 08/04/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/04/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 08/04/1994