Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 05/06/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/06/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/06/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/06/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/06/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/10/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/10/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 05/10/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/10/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/10/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/10/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 05/10/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/10/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/16/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/16/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/16/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/16/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/16/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/16/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/07/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/07/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/07/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/07/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/07/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/07/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/07/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/07/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/07/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/25/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/25/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/25/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/25/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/29/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/22/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 08/22/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/12/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 09/12/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/19/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/22/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/22/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 09/27/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/03/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/03/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/03/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/04/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/04/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/05/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/05/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/06/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/06/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/06/1994