There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate October 1994 as "Crime Prevention Month".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/12/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S11477)
08/11/1994Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
05/18/1994Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
08/16/1994-12:20pmHouseHeld at the desk.
08/16/1994-12:19pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/16/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/12/1994SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S11477)
08/11/1994SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/11/1994SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 559.
08/11/1994SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/18/1994SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
05/18/1994SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5950-5951)

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 05/18/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/18/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 06/14/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/14/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 06/14/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/29/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/29/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/29/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/29/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/29/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/29/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/12/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/12/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/12/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/18/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/18/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/18/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/18/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/18/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/18/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/18/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/18/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 08/04/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 08/04/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 08/04/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/04/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 08/04/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/04/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 08/04/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 08/11/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/18/1994 Referred to
08/11/1994 Markup by
08/11/1994 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.192. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/18/1994)

Designates October 1994 as Crime Prevention Month.