Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 05/18/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/18/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/18/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 06/14/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/14/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 06/14/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/29/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/29/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/29/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/29/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/29/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/29/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/12/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/12/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/12/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/18/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/18/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/18/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/18/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/18/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/18/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/18/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/18/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 08/04/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 08/04/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 08/04/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/04/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 08/04/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/04/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 08/04/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 08/11/1994