There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate August 1, 1994, as "Helsinki Human Rights Day".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/11/1994Became Public Law No: 103-294.
08/11/1994Signed by President.
08/03/1994Presented to President.
08/01/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
07/25/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
07/25/1994Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9649)
05/19/1994Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
08/11/1994Became Public Law No: 103-294.
08/11/1994Signed by President.
08/03/1994SenatePresented to President.
08/01/1994-1:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/01/1994-1:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
08/01/1994-1:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
08/01/1994-1:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6513-6515)
08/01/1994-1:02pmHouseMr. Hamilton moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
07/26/1994HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
07/26/1994HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
07/26/1994-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/25/1994SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
07/25/1994SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9649)
05/19/1994SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
05/19/1994SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6135)

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/19/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/19/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/19/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/23/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/12/1994

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/19/1994 Referred to
07/25/1994 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs07/26/1994 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service07/26/1994 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.195. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/19/1994)

Designates August 1, 1994, as Helsinki Human Rights Day. Authorizes the President to reassert America's commitment to the Helsinki Accords and requests him to: (1) convey to all signatories of the Accords that respect for human rights and fundamental freedoms is a vital element of further progress in the ongoing Helsinki process; and (2) develop new proposals to advance the human rights objectives of such process to address the major problems that remain.