There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution designating September 16, 1994, as "National POW/MIA Recognition Day" and authorizing display of the National League of Families POW/MIA flag.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
08/26/1994Became Public Law No: 103-320.
08/26/1994Signed by President.
08/17/1994Presented to President.
08/12/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
08/12/1994Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
08/12/1994Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
08/02/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
08/02/1994Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/25/1994Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/26/1994Became Public Law No: 103-320.
08/26/1994Signed by President.
08/17/1994SenatePresented to President.
08/12/1994-2:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/12/1994-2:31pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
08/12/1994-2:16pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8034-8036)
08/12/1994-2:16pmHouseMr. Wynn asked unanimous consent to discharge from committees and consider.
08/12/1994HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
08/12/1994HouseCommittee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
08/03/1994HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
08/03/1994HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
08/03/1994-12:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/03/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/02/1994SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
08/02/1994SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10355)
08/02/1994SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/25/1994SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (24)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/25/1994 Referred to
08/02/1994 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service08/03/1994 Referred to
08/12/1994 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs08/03/1994 Referred to
08/12/1994 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.196.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.196. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/25/1994)

Designates September 16, 1994, as National POW/MIA Recognition Day.

Requires the display of the National League of Families POW/MIA flag at: (1) all national cemeteries and the National Vietnam Veterans Memorial on May 30, 1994 (Memorial Day), September 16, 1994 (National POW/MIA Recognition Day), and November 11, 1994 (Veterans Day); and (2) the White House, the Capitol Building, and the buildings containing the primary offices of the Secretaries of State, Defense, and Veterans Affairs and the Director of the Selective Service System on September 16, 1994 (National POW/MIA Recognition Day).