Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/16/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 06/16/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/16/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/16/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/16/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/16/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/20/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/20/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/20/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/21/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/21/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/21/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/21/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/21/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/21/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/22/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/28/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/28/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/29/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/29/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/29/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/30/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/30/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/30/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/30/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/30/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/01/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/01/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/01/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/13/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/13/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/13/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/13/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/13/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/13/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 07/13/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/13/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/13/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/13/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/13/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/13/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/13/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/13/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/13/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/13/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/15/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/15/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/15/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/15/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/15/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/25/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/25/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/04/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/19/1994