Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/01/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/21/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/21/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/21/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/21/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/21/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/21/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 07/21/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 08/08/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/08/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 08/08/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/08/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 08/08/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/08/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 08/24/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 08/24/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 08/24/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/14/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 09/14/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/14/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/14/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/14/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/14/1994
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/14/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/14/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 09/20/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/20/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/23/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/23/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/23/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/23/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/23/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/23/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/23/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/23/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/23/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/27/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/27/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/30/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/30/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/30/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/30/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/30/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/30/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/30/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 09/30/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/30/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/30/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/30/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 10/03/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 10/05/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 10/05/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 10/05/1994