Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/25/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/25/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/25/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/25/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/25/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/25/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/25/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/25/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/25/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/25/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/25/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/25/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/25/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/25/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/25/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/25/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/25/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/25/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/25/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/25/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 07/25/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 08/04/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 08/04/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/04/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 08/04/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 08/04/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 08/04/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 08/04/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 08/04/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 08/04/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/04/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/04/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/04/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 08/04/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 08/04/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/05/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 08/05/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 08/05/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 08/05/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/05/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 08/05/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/05/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/05/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 08/05/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 08/05/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 08/05/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 08/05/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 08/05/1994
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 08/11/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 08/11/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 08/16/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 08/16/1994