Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/22/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/22/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/22/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/22/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/22/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/22/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/22/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/22/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/22/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/22/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/22/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/22/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/22/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/22/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/22/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/22/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/22/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/25/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/25/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 07/25/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/25/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/25/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 07/25/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/25/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/25/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/25/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/25/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/25/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/25/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/25/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/25/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/25/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/25/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/26/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/26/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/26/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/27/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/27/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/27/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/27/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/27/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 07/27/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/27/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/27/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/27/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/27/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/27/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/27/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/27/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/27/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/27/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/27/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/27/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/01/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 08/01/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 08/01/1994