Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 08/24/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 08/24/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 08/24/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 08/24/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 08/24/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 08/24/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 08/24/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 08/24/1994
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/13/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/13/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/21/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/21/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/21/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/22/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/22/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/28/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/28/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/28/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 09/28/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/29/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 10/03/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/04/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/04/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/04/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/04/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 10/04/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 10/04/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/04/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/04/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/05/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 10/05/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/05/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/06/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/06/1994