There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to express the sense of the Congress in commemoration of the 75th anniversary of Grand Canyon National Park.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/08/1994Became Public Law No: 103-351.
10/08/1994Signed by President.
10/07/1994Presented to President.
10/07/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
10/07/1994Committee on Natural Resources discharged.
09/23/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S13316)
09/23/1994Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
11/21/1994HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/08/1994Became Public Law No: 103-351.
10/08/1994Signed by President.
10/07/1994SenatePresented to President.
10/07/1994-2:15amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/07/1994-2:15amHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
10/07/1994-2:15amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H11136-11137)
10/07/1994-2:15amHouseMr. Vento asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/07/1994HouseCommittee on Natural Resources discharged.
09/26/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
09/26/1994-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/26/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/23/1994SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S13316)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 09/23/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources09/26/1994 Referred to
10/07/1994 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands11/21/1994 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.221. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/23/1994)

Expresses the sense of the Congress in commemoration of the 75th anniversary of the Grand Canyon National Park.