Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/28/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/02/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/02/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/02/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/02/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/02/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/02/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/02/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/02/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/02/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/02/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/02/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/02/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 02/02/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/02/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 02/02/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/02/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 02/02/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 02/02/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/03/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/03/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/03/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/03/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/03/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/03/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/03/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/03/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/04/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/04/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/04/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/04/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/04/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/04/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/04/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/04/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 02/04/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/04/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/16/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/16/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/16/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/16/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/16/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/16/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/16/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/16/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/24/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/24/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/04/1993