Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/28/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/04/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/04/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/04/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/04/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/04/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/04/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/04/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/04/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/04/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/04/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/04/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/04/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/04/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/04/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/04/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 02/04/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 02/04/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/04/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/04/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/04/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/04/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/04/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/04/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/04/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/04/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/04/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/04/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 02/04/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/04/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 02/04/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 02/17/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/17/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/17/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/17/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 02/17/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/17/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/17/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/24/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/24/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/24/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/24/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/02/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 03/02/1993