Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/03/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/17/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/17/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 02/24/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 05/20/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/23/1993