Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/04/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/16/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/16/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/16/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/16/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/16/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/16/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/16/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/16/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/17/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/17/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/18/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/18/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/24/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/24/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/24/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/24/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/24/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/24/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/24/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/24/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 02/24/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/25/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/25/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/09/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/10/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/10/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/15/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/16/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/16/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/22/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/22/1993