There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution designating the week beginning June 6, 1993, and June 5, 1994, as "Lyme Disease Awareness Week".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
06/08/1993Became Public Law No: 103-41.
06/08/1993Signed by President.
05/27/1993Presented to President.
05/25/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
05/25/1993Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
03/26/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S3907-3908)
03/25/1993Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
02/04/1993Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
06/08/1993Became Public Law No: 103-41.
06/08/1993Signed by President.
05/27/1993SenatePresented to President.
05/25/1993-6:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/25/1993-6:53pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
05/25/1993HouseCommittee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
05/25/1993-6:50pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2774-2775)
05/25/1993-6:50pmHouseMs. Byrne asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
03/29/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
03/29/1993-3:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/29/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/26/1993SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3907-3908)
03/25/1993SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 49.
03/25/1993SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/25/1993SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/04/1993SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
02/04/1993SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1491-1492)
02/02/1993SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1073)

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/04/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/18/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/18/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/18/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/18/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/18/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/18/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/18/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/18/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/18/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/18/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/18/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/18/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/18/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/18/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/18/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/18/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/18/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/18/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/18/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/18/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/18/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/18/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/18/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/18/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/18/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/18/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/18/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/18/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/18/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/18/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/18/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/18/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/18/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/18/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 02/18/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/18/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/18/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/18/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/18/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/18/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 02/18/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/18/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/18/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/18/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/18/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/18/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/18/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/18/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/18/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/18/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/18/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/18/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/11/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 03/11/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 04/02/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/02/1993

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/04/1993 Referred to
03/25/1993 Markup by
03/25/1993 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service03/29/1993 Referred to
05/25/1993 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.43. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/04/1993)

Designates the weeks beginning June 6, 1993, and June 5, 1994, as Lyme Disease Awareness Week.