Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/25/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/25/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/02/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/02/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/02/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/03/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/03/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/03/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/10/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/11/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/11/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/18/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/31/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/05/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/05/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/21/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/21/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/22/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/26/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/26/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/26/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/26/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/26/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/26/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/26/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/26/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/26/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/26/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/26/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/26/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 07/26/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/26/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/26/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/26/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/26/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/26/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 11/09/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/09/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 11/09/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 11/09/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 11/09/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 11/09/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 11/09/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/09/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/09/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 11/09/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/09/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 11/09/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/09/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 11/09/1993