Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 03/02/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 03/02/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/04/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/09/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/11/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/11/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/11/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/11/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/19/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/19/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/19/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/19/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/26/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/06/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/26/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/26/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/08/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/08/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/09/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/22/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/22/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/21/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/21/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/25/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 10/28/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 11/04/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/04/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/04/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/04/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/09/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 11/10/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/10/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/10/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 11/17/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/17/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/17/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 11/17/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/17/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 11/17/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 11/17/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/17/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 11/17/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 11/17/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 11/17/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 11/18/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 11/19/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 11/20/1993