Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/11/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/11/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/11/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/11/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/11/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/11/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/11/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/11/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/11/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/11/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/11/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/11/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/11/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/11/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/11/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/11/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/11/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/11/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/11/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/11/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 03/11/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/11/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/11/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/11/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 03/11/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/11/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/11/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/11/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/17/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/17/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/17/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/17/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 03/17/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/17/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/18/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/18/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/18/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/19/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 03/24/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/29/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/29/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/29/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/29/1993