Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/05/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/05/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/05/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/05/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/05/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/05/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/05/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/05/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/05/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/05/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/05/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/05/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/05/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/05/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/20/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 04/20/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 04/20/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/20/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/20/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/20/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/22/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/28/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 04/28/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/28/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/28/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/28/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/28/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/28/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/29/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 04/29/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/29/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/29/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/29/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/29/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/29/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/29/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/29/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/29/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 04/29/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 05/04/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/04/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/04/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/04/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/04/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/04/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/04/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/04/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/04/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/04/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/04/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/05/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 05/05/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 05/06/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 05/06/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/13/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/13/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/04/1993