Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/30/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/30/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/30/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/30/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/30/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/30/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/30/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/30/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/30/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/30/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/30/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/30/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/31/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/31/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/31/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/19/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/19/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/19/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/19/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/19/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/19/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/19/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/19/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/19/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/28/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/28/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/28/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 04/28/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/29/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 04/29/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/18/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/18/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/18/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/18/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/18/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/25/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/25/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/25/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/25/1993