Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/10/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 03/10/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/16/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/16/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/16/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/16/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/16/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/16/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/16/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/25/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/25/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/25/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/25/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/25/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/25/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/05/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/05/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/05/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/05/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/04/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/04/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/04/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/04/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 05/04/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/04/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/04/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/06/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/06/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/18/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/18/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/26/1993