Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 04/02/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/02/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/02/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/02/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/02/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/02/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/02/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/27/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/27/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/27/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/18/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/18/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/18/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/18/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/18/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/18/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/18/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/18/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/18/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/18/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 05/18/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 06/09/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/09/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/10/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/10/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/10/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/10/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/10/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/10/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/10/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/10/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/10/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/10/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/19/1994