Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/26/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 03/26/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 03/26/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 03/26/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/26/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/26/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/20/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/20/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/20/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/20/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/20/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/28/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/28/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/28/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/28/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/04/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 05/04/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 05/06/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/06/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/06/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/13/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/13/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/13/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/13/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/13/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/18/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/18/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/18/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/18/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/18/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/18/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/18/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/18/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/18/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/18/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/19/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/19/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/19/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/19/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/19/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/19/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/19/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/19/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/19/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/19/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 05/19/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/19/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/19/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/19/1993