Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/31/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/02/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 04/02/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/02/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/27/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/27/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/27/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/27/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 04/27/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/18/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/18/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/18/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/18/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/18/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/07/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/07/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 06/07/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/07/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/07/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/21/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/21/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/21/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/21/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/21/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 08/06/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 08/06/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/06/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 08/06/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 08/06/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 08/06/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/07/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/07/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/07/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/07/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/07/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 09/20/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/20/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/20/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/20/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/20/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/07/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/07/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/07/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/07/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/07/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/07/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/07/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/07/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/07/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/07/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/07/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/07/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 10/07/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/07/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 10/07/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/13/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 10/13/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/13/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/26/1993