Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 04/02/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/27/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/27/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/27/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/27/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/27/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/28/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/28/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/29/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/29/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/29/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/06/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/18/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/18/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/18/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/20/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/24/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/15/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 06/15/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/15/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/17/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/17/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/22/1993