Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 04/21/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/04/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 05/04/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/04/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/18/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/19/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/20/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/07/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/07/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/07/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/07/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/13/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/13/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/19/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/19/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 10/19/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/03/1993